Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHAGFORD
Charity number: 1172274
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LUCY HELEN SHIELDS | Chair | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Anne Holyoak | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr COLIN GREENHILL BARNES BSC FRCP | Trustee | 14 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ARTHUR WOOD | Trustee | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET FLORENCE JEFFREYS | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY JEAN BLEAKMAN | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ELVA JOAN HODGSON | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANN LESLEY HAIGH | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE CHARLES BLEAKMAN | Trustee | 23 April 2013 |
|
|||||
JULIA FRANCES ENDACOTT | Trustee | 01 April 1980 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.