EASTBOURNE CHURCHES VISITING

Charity number: 1171917
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 05 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 28 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 06 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 06 March 2019 On time Download