SADAKA

Charity number: 1171075
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SHAJNA RASHID REHAN Trustee 23 November 2018 None on record
Fatima Alla-Saouiki Trustee 28 November 2019 None on record
Joe Gibbons Trustee 12 December 2020 None on record
Dr SUNILA LOBO Chair 01 February 2018 None on record
Youssef Alla Trustee 03 December 2020 None on record
Zobia Kalim Trustee 09 August 2020 None on record