Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER & ST PAUL, COLESHILL
Charity number: 1171210
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nanette Walker | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Hudson | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Bramley | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Tannock | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Denise Davies | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Leary | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN TARVER | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nanette Gallai | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julie Murphy | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|||||
GERARDUS BAKKER | Trustee | 19 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MAXWELL | Trustee | 19 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ABIGAIL LAURA JEYS | Trustee | 19 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA DAVIES | Trustee | 19 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
JULIET BAKKER | Trustee | 25 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.