Financial history 'EMBRACEME' FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1172342
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/04/2018 06/04/2019 06/04/2020 06/04/2021 06/04/2022
Total gross income £1.20k £1.11k £0 £0 £41.82k
Total expenditure £1.50k £1.44k £0 £0 £23.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A