THE SAFFI FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1172261
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 05 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 03 October 2018 On time Download