YIEWSLEY AND WEST DRAYTON FOODBANK

Charity number: 1171141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 03 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 03 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 27 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 03 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 03 February 2019 On time Download