Trustees CATERHAM HILL WI
Charity number: 1171364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dianne Pullin | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Rizhanovsky | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Hughesman | Trustee | 21 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE SHAW | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE DEBORAH HEWITT | Trustee | 09 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHEENA LANDGRAF | Trustee | 09 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
ISABELLE HOLMWOOD | Trustee | 09 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
VANESSA JACKSON | Trustee | 09 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.