Governing document DOVE HOUSE HOSPICE LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 MAY 1980 AS AMENDED 21 DECEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17 AUG 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 AUG 2016 as amended on 12 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE ASSOCIATION SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
NORTH HUMBERSIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.