SIRI GURU SINGH SABHA GURDWARA, BRISTOL

Charity number: 1180348

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PARMJIT KAUR Trustee 13 September 2015 None on record
NARINDER KAUR Trustee 15 June 2014 None on record
GURDIAL SINGH Trustee 19 September 2015 None on record
RAVINDER SINGH DHINSAY Trustee 16 October 2016 None on record
JASWINDERPAL SINGH Trustee 24 January 2016 None on record
Davinder Singh Matharu Trustee 02 September 2018 None on record
BALVIR SINGH Trustee 15 September 2015 None on record
SURINDER KAUR DHINSA Trustee 21 August 2011 None on record
Nirmal Kaur Bal Trustee 02 February 2020 None on record
RAVINDER KAUR BISLA Trustee 15 June 2014 None on record
PIARA SINGH DHINSAY Trustee 16 October 2016 None on record
METOW KAUR Trustee 15 June 2014 None on record
SARBJIT SINGH BISLA Chair 13 September 2015 None on record
Jernail Singh Sandhu Trustee 05 August 2018 None on record