Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF SALISBURY MEDICAL PRACTICE

Charity number: 1172839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 24 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 24 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 12 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 12 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 03 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 03 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 16 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 16 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window