Trustees THE HONOURABLE COMPANY OF MASTER MARINERS AND HOWARD LEOPOLD DAVIS CHARITY
Charity number: 1172234
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Captain Charles Brewer MBA, AFNI | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Captain Geoffrey English AFNI | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Captain Peter James McArthur CMMar FNI | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Captain Derek CHADBURN | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lt Cdr Peter Aylott | Trustee | 02 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Captain Richard Barnes CMMar | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Captain Jeremy Mooney | Trustee | 31 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Captain Howard James Conybeare | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
LES CHAPMAN, BENG, MBA | Trustee | 16 October 2014 |
|
|||||
CAPTAIN N F RODRIGUES | Trustee | 01 January 2009 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.