Financial history KANTOR FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1173549
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £165.33k £1.72m £4.63m £1.36m £1.41m
Total expenditure £138.64k £1.50m £3.83m £1.48m £1.66m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £1.72m £4.63m £1.36m £1.41m
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £535 £609 £117 £82
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £1.50m £3.83m £1.48m £1.66m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £56.63k £9.90k £11.46k £11.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £1.32m £3.65m £1.39m £1.61m
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0