Financial history FRIENDS OF ST MATTHEW'S CHURCH, BLACKMOOR & WHITEHILL

Charity number: 1172369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £19.85k £14.64k £13.22k £6.53k £7.23k
Total expenditure £1.86k £24.61k £2.10k £22.92k £1.23k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A