GERMAN SHORTHAIRED POINTER TRUST

Charity number: 1172457
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 February 2020 17 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 February 2020 17 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 01 February 2019 25 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 February 2019 25 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 01 February 2018 20 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 February 2018 20 November 2018 On time Download