Trustees STEPHEN COX GARDEN TRUST
Charity number: 1174239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN BEN COX B.A. | Chair | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Meier | Trustee | 09 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon Kerstan | Trustee | 03 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Miller | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Iain Jessup | Trustee | 14 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS SELF | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
COLETTE SOM | Trustee | 24 March 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.