Financial history Afreuro diaspora group

Charity number: 1173695
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £30.00k £0 £0 £0 £50.00k
Total expenditure £15.00k £0 £0 £0 £40.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A