THE MARKETING ACADEMY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1173977
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 30 July 2019 28 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2019 28 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 July 2018 02 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2018 02 May 2019 On time Download