Accounts and annual returns ALMOST HOME DOG RESCUE

Charity number: 1172601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 November 2020 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 November 2020 17 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 22 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window