BRIGG DISTRICT LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity number: 1172651
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 17 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 17 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 08 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 08 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 11 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 11 December 2018 On time Download