Trustees YOUNG CARERS' CREW (NORTH HERTFORDSHIRE AND STEVENAGE)

Charity number: 1176778
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Neville Rowe Chair 08 February 2018
None on record
Peter John Hopkins Trustee 04 April 2022
None on record
Anna Elise Taylor Trustee 12 November 2020
None on record
JO WARD Trustee 13 October 2016
None on record
HELEN MARGARET ROWE Trustee 04 November 2014
HITCHIN SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA
Received: On time