Accounts and annual returns TURKEY LANE AND MONSALL NEIGHBOURHOOD CENTRE

Charity number: 510184
Charity reporting is overdue by 77 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 77 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 77 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 February 2023 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 February 2023 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window