Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS HARROW WEALD
Charity number: 1173619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev John William Barker | Chair | 18 July 2019 |
|
|||||||
Michael Gerald Butler | Trustee | 05 November 2023 |
|
|||||||
Jo Lever | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|||||||
Anthony Hassan | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|||||||
Denise Mordell | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|||||||
Denise Cooper | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|||||||
Derek James | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
John Abbott | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Margaret Rodger | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Linda Gathercole | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
EDITH MARY STEELE | Trustee | 30 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
PHILIPPA JACKSON | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|||||||
Mary Elizabeth Abbott | Trustee | 30 April 2003 |
|
|||||||
MANDY SUZANNE WHITFIELD | Trustee | 30 April 2003 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.