SPICER STREET CHURCH

Charity number: 1173938
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JUSTIN KINGSLEY SLEEP Trustee 11 July 2017 None on record
NEIL INNES JEFFERIES Trustee 30 January 2019 None on record
DAVID ANTHONY BENNETT SHAW Trustee 09 May 2018 None on record
DANIEL GEORGE HOOK Trustee 11 July 2017 None on record
TERENCE JOHN WARD Trustee 11 July 2017 None on record
REV DR GREGORY JOHN STRAIN Chair 11 July 2017
HERTFORD TOWN CHURCH Recently registered
Philip William Vance Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
STEPHEN PAGET HOUNSLOW Trustee 11 July 2017 None on record
DAVID JAMES NICHOLSON Trustee 28 November 2018 None on record
CHRISTOPHER CHARLES UPTON Trustee 11 July 2017 None on record
FRANK WILLIAM GUEST Trustee 11 July 2017 None on record