WALTHAMSTOW TOY LIBRARY AND PLAY CENTRE

Charity number: 1178098
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Farah Syed Chair 30 September 2020 None on record
Noella Gooden Trustee 15 October 2018 None on record
Katherine Boyle Trustee 11 November 2019 None on record
Hannah Randle Trustee 11 November 2019 None on record
Romily Hall Trustee 11 November 2019 None on record
Read Baurtally Trustee 21 April 2020 None on record
Natalie Stephens-Sleigh Trustee 20 April 2020 None on record