Accounts and annual returns CODE YOUR FUTURE

Charity number: 1174929
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 November 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 02 November 2020 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 19 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window