Trustees PRAMA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1174197
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NICHOLAS CHARLES JOHNSON Chair 08 November 2017
PRAMACARE
Received: On time
KEYCHANGE CHARITY
Received: On time
PramaLife
Received: On time
STUMPWELL HOUSING ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Recently registered
Jacqui Rock Trustee 02 March 2023
PRAMACARE
Received: On time
THE BOURNEMOUTH CHAMBER OF TRADE BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
EDWARD THOMAS OLIVER ADAMSON Trustee 01 December 2021
BEYOND THE WILD
Overdue by 121 days
PRAMACARE
Received: On time
Colin Bennett Trustee 23 June 2021
None on record
DAVID LAWRENCE FRANK CAWDERY Trustee 19 June 2019
THE REPOSM SPORTING HOUSING TRUST
Overdue by 29 days
THE REPOSM SPORTING HOUSING TRUST
Received: On time
Robert Julian Pringle Trustee 05 December 2018
PRAMACARE
Received: On time
Norma Lee Trustee 08 November 2017
PRAMACARE
Received: On time
PramaLife
Received: On time
ROBERT KEITH ALLAM Trustee 08 November 2017
PRAMACARE
Received: On time
CAROLA CLAIRE CAMPBELL Trustee 18 May 2017
THE GREENHILL FELLOWSHIP TRUST
Received: On time