THE FRIENDS OF WEARE SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1173651
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 20 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required