BOLLINGTON COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1173917
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 09 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 09 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 15 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 15 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 09 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 06 January 2020 128 days late Download