Accounts and annual returns MID CHESHIRE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1173890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 15 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window