ULBC TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1174721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Zoe Parish Chair 02 April 2015
NIND'S WANDSWORTH CHURCH TRUST Received: On time
MORGAN STANLEY INTERNATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
Dr GORDON ELLIOTT Trustee 07 June 2012 None on record
NATHANIEL REILLY-O'DONNELL Trustee 13 May 2017 None on record
JOHN MORRIS KINNEAR Trustee 22 January 2009 None on record
HUMPHRY HATTON Trustee 01 September 2009 None on record