Trustees NORTHUMBRIA STUDENTS' UNION
Charity number: 1174053
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sai Gopala Krishna Reddy Maram | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Jobes | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Arushi Sinha | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kishore Kanchi | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Steadman | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Pearson | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harvey Burn | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Hasmujaj | Trustee | 18 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kishti Tanna | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Harriette Moore | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Liv Bird | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nerius Shah | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Elaine Long | Trustee | 05 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Edward Alastair Kelly | Trustee | 05 October 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.