Trustees BURMANTOFTS SENIOR ACTION CIO

Charity number: 1175661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Councillor Denise Ragan Chair 22 August 2019
GREEN LEEDS LIMITED
Received: On time
LEEDS GRAND THEATRE AND OPERA HOUSE LIMITED
Received: On time
Donald Forrester Trustee 05 October 2022
None on record
Jean Stafford Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Aghar Khan Trustee 13 July 2022
None on record
Moira Flynn Trustee 22 March 2022
None on record
Tricia Gradys Trustee 19 February 2020
None on record
PAUL ANTHONY KELLY Trustee 17 April 2017
None on record