Accounts and annual returns M A GRUNWALD CHARITY

Charity number: 1173611
Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 Overdue Overdue by 20 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Overdue Overdue by 20 days
Annual return 30 June 2020 14 May 2021 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 14 May 2021 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 14 May 2021 379 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 14 May 2021 379 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 09 March 2020 314 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 09 March 2020 314 days late Download Open in new window