Accounts and annual returns BLOOMIN' DEMENTIA

Charity number: 1174849
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 24 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 24 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 15 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 15 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2018 16 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 16 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window