Accounts and annual returns SERVING HUMANITY WELFARE
Charity number: 1176842
Charity reporting is overdue by 1612 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 151 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 151 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 June 2024 | 511 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 June 2024 | 511 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 June 2024 | 876 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 June 2024 | 876 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 May 2024 | 1200 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 May 2024 | 1200 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1612 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1612 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window