Accounts and annual returns HASTINGS AND ST LEONARDS MEN'S SHED

Charity number: 1175075
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 28 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 28 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 02 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 05 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 10 October 2019 01 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 October 2019 01 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 10 October 2018 18 August 2019 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 October 2018 18 August 2019 8 days late Download Open in new window