Trustees MOLD MISSION AREA
Charity number: 1176095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
30 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Weston | Chair | 19 November 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Susan Maguire | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Matthew Alexander Taylor | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Marion Watts | Trustee | 29 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
DAWN MARIE WOLSTENHOLME | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Daniel Morgan | Trustee | 02 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Esther Joanna Andrews | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Delyth Mary Puleston Roberts | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Gillian Neath | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH SAWYER | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Adrian Maguire | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Anne Jones | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Canon Martin John Batchelor | Trustee | 28 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
LINDSAY CATHERINE WILDING | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
DARYL ANNE AUSTIN | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
MICHAEL JOHN MARK CORDINER | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
ELIZABETH ANNE THOMAS | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Clive Briscoe | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
DAVID DOUGLAS WRIGHT | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH HELLEN | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Helen Bernardette Briscoe | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
MELANIE ELIZABETH MORGAN CONDREN | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
PETER JOHN DAVIES | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
DOROTHY KATHLEEN MASON | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|||||||||
HELEN AMANDA GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|||||||||
JOSEPH KENNETH BICKERTON | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev DANIEL JOSEPH SHINE STROUD | Trustee | 04 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr WENDY ELIZABETH SHILLITO | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev KATHRYN SUSAN STEWART | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
KENNETH MASSEY | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.