ABBEYFIELD SILVERDALE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1174376
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Guy Davies Trustee 10 January 2011
MOURHOLME LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY Received: On time
Rev Paul Warren Trustee 09 February 2009 None on record
John Robson Trustee 14 November 2005 None on record
Jean Jones Trustee 01 April 2016 None on record
Susan Caddy Trustee 15 April 2019 None on record
Dr Noel Jerry Martin Trustee 29 January 2018 None on record
Dr June Greenwell Trustee 13 January 1997 None on record
Andrew Wells Chair 24 September 2018 None on record
Francis Michael Casson Trustee 01 March 2019 None on record
Martyn Rhodes Trustee 13 January 2020 None on record