THE EXARCHATE PARISH OF ST AIDAN & ST CHAD, NOTTINGHAM ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN PROPERTY TRUST DEED

Charity number: 1174715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 November 2021 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 September 2020 306 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required