Trustees Durham Samaritans
Charity number: 1173976
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeremy Felix Disley | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Donald Stronach | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janine Schaffrath | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan John Macdonald | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barry Thomas William Akins | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Elizabeth Gloria Maxwell | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Ian Rayner | Trustee | 30 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA LOUISE WINTER | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEAN STORES | Trustee | 31 October 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.