Trustees APHASIA RE-CONNECT

Charity number: 1176125
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lin Cockayne Trustee 17 March 2022
None on record
John Sayers Trustee 25 January 2021
None on record
Virginia Lois Clark Trustee 30 April 2019
None on record
Rachel Green Trustee 24 July 2018
None on record
Professor Ekaterini Katerina Hilari Trustee 24 July 2018
None on record
Holly Terry Trustee 23 July 2018
None on record