Accounts and annual returns CHABAD ON THE SOUTH BANK

Charity number: 1176543
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 01 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 09 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 09 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window