Accounts and annual returns PARKRUN GLOBAL LIMITED

Charity number: 1175062
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 18 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 18 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 19 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 19 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2019 29 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 29 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window