Trustees THE WAYFINDERWOMAN TRUST
Charity number: 1175486
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
laura murphy | Chair | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Helen Peckham | Trustee | 15 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anneke Langford-Hebbelinck | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Irene Anderson | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jill Lovegrove | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Rowe | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Bush | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cherine Maskill | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tammara Anderton | Trustee | 30 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Burrell | Trustee | 30 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Xerxes | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Day | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.