BOURNE TOWN HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1176315

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHARLES JOHN HOUSEAGO Chair 11 September 2017 None on record
Katrina Lloyd Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
KEVIN LESLIE FISHER Trustee 11 September 2017 None on record
Rannadevi Rajnikant Patel Trustee 12 August 2019 None on record
Nicola Ann Ferguson Trustee 26 September 2018 None on record
Hilary Elizabeth Bloomer Trustee 22 May 2018 None on record