Trustees NOTTINGHAM NARROW BOAT PROJECT LTD
Charity number: 1176252
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Pynager | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amber Nicola Tipper | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Mary Greaves | Trustee | 22 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Matthew Barron | Trustee | 22 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gary Nevil Bramley | Trustee | 28 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK JOHN MACLEAN EMMERSON FCA | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.