Accounts and annual returns THE ROYAL AIR FORCE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1176054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 28 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 28 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 09 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 09 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2019 03 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 03 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window