Accounts and annual returns BRISTOL HOSPITAL BROADCASTING SERVICE

Charity number: 1177939
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 19 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 19 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 23 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 23 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2019 21 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 21 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window