Trustees BACD
Charity number: 1181666
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Catherine Fairris | Chair | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eithne Rose Brenner | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Manav Bawa | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nestor Demosthenous | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sophie Mariete SHOTTER | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bhavjit Kaur | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Agnieszka Zatonska | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN BALFOUR ELDER | Trustee | 18 December 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.